ST MARY'S FARNHAM ROYAL CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL - SCHOOL FUND ACCOUNT

Charity number: 1122654
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 April 2021 294 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 06 January 2020 190 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 19 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 28 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 June 2017 On time Download