THE DOREEN DAPHNE SKINNER TRUST

Charity number: 1130045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 January 2020 354 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 January 2020 354 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 August 2018 212 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required