THE MCMILLAN FAMILY TRUST

Charity number: 1122913
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £1.77k £4.26k
Total expenditure £2 £0 £0 £0 £11
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A