INSTITUTE FOR GOVERNMENT

Charity number: 1123926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.21m £4.39m £4.54m £4.75m £5.24m
Total expenditure £4.37m £4.64m £4.68m £4.87m £4.58m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £83.17k £80.19k £92.22k £83.66k £100.82k
Income - Charitable activities £4.07m £4.24m £4.38m £4.58m £5.00m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £703 £78 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £53.42k £67.92k £61.67k £80.86k £134.87k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.33m £4.60m £4.60m £4.80m £4.52m
Expenditure - Raising funds £39.71k £41.46k £72.46k £61.22k £58.84k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £29.82k £38.34k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0