ARDINGLY CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1123464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 02 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 27 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 01 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 19 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required