Accounts and annual returns BRITISH UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEGES SPORT LIMITED

Charity number: 1126863
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 June 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 08 June 2021 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 28 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 28 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 17 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 17 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 16 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 16 April 2018 On time
Annual return 31 July 2016 12 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 12 April 2017 On time Download Open in new window