Financial history BRITISH UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEGES SPORT LIMITED

Charity number: 1126863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £3.87m £4.67m £4.97m £3.90m £2.27m
Total expenditure £4.20m £4.53m £4.93m £3.84m £2.46m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £184.80k £219.00k £303.71k £193.14k £306.16k
Income - Donations and legacies £136.62k £160.17k £5.87k £33.91k £0
Income - Other trading activities £238.11k £208.49k £380.71k £136.91k £134.64k
Income - Charitable activities £3.50m £4.28m £4.45m £3.61m £1.98m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £21.11k £15.74k £17.21k £20.38k
Income - Other £0 £0 £115.38k £103.91k £136.24k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.20m £4.53m £4.56m £3.43m £2.26m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £370.01k £415.30k £200.01k
Expenditure - Governance £40.08k £179.44k £53.99k £34.45k £43.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £609.80k £425.08k £117.97k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £3.56k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0