Trustees BRITISH UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEGES SPORT LIMITED

Charity number: 1126863
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Craig Austin Mahoney Chair 05 December 2019
None on record
Zoe Clifton Trustee 22 July 2021
None on record
Simon Wilson Trustee 09 December 2020
None on record
Jennifer Agnew Trustee 09 December 2020
None on record
Madeleine Juliette Cannell Trustee 24 July 2020
None on record
Cathy Gallagher Trustee 02 November 2018
None on record
Josef Baines Trustee 27 April 2018
None on record
Katy Elizabeth Storie Trustee 05 December 2017
DAME ALLAN'S SCHOOLS
Received: On time
Born Barikor Trustee 05 December 2017
LTA TENNIS FOUNDATION
Received: On time