CHRIST CHURCH HAYWARDS HEATH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday Morning Meeting 10.30am Evening Meeting 6.30pm Young People's Groups: regular meetings for children and young people of all ages with a wide range of activities such as active games, crafts and drama and relevant Bible teaching discussion. Other Bible studies and exploring Christianity Courses www.cchh.org.uk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 25 February 2008: Standard registration
- 15 September 2021: Funds received from 1112102 SALTWORKZ
- CHRIST CHURCH HAYWARDS HEATH LIMITED (Previous name)
- HAYWARDS HEATH EVANGELICAL FREE CHURCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin James Strudwick | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Christopher Thomas | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Mark Field | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nathan John Severs | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Philip Mills | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARK JONATHAN VENTHAM | Trustee |
|
||||||
Graham Paul Nicholls | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £248.82k | £309.09k | £280.94k | £464.78k | £386.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £245.50k | £265.03k | £291.78k | £311.80k | £348.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/12/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/05/2011 as amended on 05 May 2022 as amended on 12 May 2022
Charitable objects
3. The Charity's objects ("the Objects") are: (a) to advance and practise the Christian faith in accordance with the Statement of Beliefs in Haywards Heath and in such other parts of the United Kingdom or the world as the trustees may from time to time think fit; and (b) such other charitable purposes as shall, in the opinion of the trustees, put into practice the Christian faith in accordance with the Statement of Beliefs, including but not limited to: the relief of sickness, distress and financial hardship and the promotion and preservation of good health by the provision of funds, goods or services of any kind, including through the provision of counselling, education and support and by the promotion of spiritual and physical well-being in the said location and in such other parts of the United Kingdom or the world as the trustees from time to time may think fit.
Area of benefit
HAYWARDS HEATH, OTHER SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christ Church
New England Road
HAYWARDS HEATH
West Sussex
RH16 3LE
- Phone:
- 014444459980
- Email:
- ask@cchh.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window