Financial history HELP HOIMA

Charity number: 1123088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £89.52k £58.32k £84.37k £40.16k £24.22k
Total expenditure £115.84k £48.75k £46.78k £77.74k £399
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A