CHARITABLE FUND FOR HUMAN AND LABOUR RIGHTS

Charity number: 1140082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required