THE BROOK TRUST

Charity number: 1123562
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £535.82k £1.98m £2.64m £125.45k £119.64k
Total expenditure £876.77k £920.85k £1.44m £1.26m £1.19m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £437.50k £1.88m £2.50m N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £98.32k £100.99k £140.23k N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £876.77k £920.85k £1.44m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £20.95k £20.08k £22.56k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £855.82k £900.77k £1.41m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A