Accounts and annual returns BILLINGSHURST FAMILY CHURCH

Charity number: 1123028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 19 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window