Trustees ST MILDREDS PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1123421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Natalie Harrison Stokes Trustee 03 December 2020
None on record
Lee Cole Trustee 03 December 2020
None on record
Leigh Anderson Trustee 03 December 2020
None on record
Nina Callard Trustee 03 December 2020
None on record
Debbie Farbrace Trustee 03 December 2020
None on record
Nichola Perry Trustee 03 December 2020
None on record
Laura Collett Trustee 31 October 2019
None on record
Rachel Humber Trustee 31 October 2019
None on record
Gemma Osborne Trustee 08 October 2019
None on record
Stacey Linton Trustee 08 October 2019
None on record
Katy Boulton Trustee 03 October 2019
None on record
Anna Tate Trustee 03 October 2019
None on record
Jenny Smith Trustee 28 June 2019
None on record
Elena Maria Hill Trustee 25 March 2015
None on record