SUPPORTERS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH IN LOUGHBOROUGH

Charity number: 1129648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 06 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 06 November 2020 275 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 04 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 09 February 2017 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required