THE GREAT COMMISSION MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Great Commission Ministry's main goal is to spread the gospel and see believers grow in faith. In doing so we also meet the practical needs of the community and regurarly help the poor, sick, homeless & elderly. We provide opportunities for basic training to help people be in touch with modern tecnology, and encourage members to use their natural gifts whether it be in music, dance, or drama.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
95 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barking And Dagenham
- Cambridgeshire
- Coventry City
- Derbyshire
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Luton
- Newham
- Somerset
- Surrey
- France
- Philippines
- Spain
Governance
- 31 March 2008: Standard registration
- 06 July 2011: Funds received from 1056124 THE GREAT COMMISSION MINISTRY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marife Colis | Trustee | 20 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Felix Perez | Trustee | 20 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alejandro Romano | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sammy David Bolor | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALMA IBALE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £310.77k | £332.48k | £326.70k | £381.14k | £401.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £305.79k | £201.90k | £234.48k | £254.76k | £269.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 February 2025 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
25 February 2025 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2023
(These accounts |
02 May 2024 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 12 April 2023 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2022
(These accounts |
12 April 2023 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/12/2007
Charitable objects
3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH 3.2 THE FURTHERANCE OF THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED IN PRACTICE LONDON W14
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shepherds Bush Baptist Church
Shepherds Bush Road
LONDON
W6 7NA
- Phone:
- 02085774437
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
thegcm.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window