BRISTOL NATURAL HISTORY CONSORTIUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A range of public, professional development and educational events on best practice in environmental communication
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 03 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leah Anne McNally | Trustee | 19 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Julie Doherty | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Justin Collard Morris | Trustee | 12 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Edwin Ball | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN BRASHER | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £244.55k | £221.21k | £213.43k | £342.68k | £457.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £201.98k | £173.10k | £220.93k | £342.63k | £470.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £19.00k | £10.00k | £20.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 JANUARY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 DEC 2017 as amended on 08 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF WILDLIFE AND THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND THEIR CONSERVATION.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bristol Natural History Consortium
Jubilee House
Bristol
Avon
BS1 4RW
- Phone:
- 0117 325 2891
- Email:
- info@bnhc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window