DIANA MARY SYMON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1122950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 09 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 07 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 25 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required