AL-KHAIR FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1126808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 31 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 31 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 29 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 29 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 28 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 28 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 30 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 30 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 04 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 04 May 2017 On time Download