Financial history AL-KHAIR FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1126808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £20.15m £23.74m £20.81m £20.58m £25.99m
Total expenditure £15.92m £21.74m £23.44m £18.64m £25.37m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £18.38m £22.01m £20.68m £18.65m £23.66m
Income - Other trading activities £22.13k £1.72m £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.73m £0 £0 £1.83m £1.85m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £7.07k £0 £0
Income - Other £5.95k £8.14k £115.62k £102.38k £479.57k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £15.22m £19.38m £22.72m £17.94m £24.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds £700.57k £722.01k £719.15k £697.88k £700.69k
Expenditure - Governance £26.83k £46.95k £23.92k £37.42k £32.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £1.63m £0 £0 £0