Accounts and annual returns ST JAMES THE GREAT CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1123161
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 February 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 February 2020 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 February 2019 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 February 2019 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 February 2018 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 February 2018 23 days late Download Open in new window