Financial history ST JAMES THE GREAT CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1123161
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £99.36k £88.99k £75.05k £15.08k £17.55k
Total expenditure £209.31k £159.10k £75.00k £45.01k £17.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A