ST JAMES THE GREAT CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants made to St James the Great School to provide additional resources. Support has been given to enable additional provision to be provided for disadvantaged families to enable them to have access to a wide range of extra curricula provision.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Croydon
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Merton
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
- Sutton
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 12 March 2008: Standard registration
- 20 March 2019: Funds received from 1136421 CROYDON FAITH EDUCATION RESOURCES
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Andrew | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|||||
EDWIN ABREO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.05k | £15.08k | £17.55k | £38.57k | £17.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.00k | £45.01k | £17.27k | £67.00k | £100.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT ROMAN CATHOLIC SCHOOLS IN THE DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK IN PARTICULAR TO PUPILS OF ST JAMES THE GREAT ROMAN CATHOLIC PRIMARY AND NURSERY SCHOOL, WINDSOR ROAD, THORNTON HEATH, SURREY (THE SCHOOL); AND 2 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT IMPOSING ANY LIMITATION) BY PROVIDING GRANTS AND BURSARIES FOR PUPILS AT ROMAN CATHOLIC SCHOOLS IN THE DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK IN PARTICULAR TO PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
SOUTHWARK
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. JAMES THE GREAT SCHOOL
WINDSOR ROAD
THORNTON HEATH
CR7 8HJ
- Phone:
- 020 8768 1047
- Email:
- finance@stjamesthegreat.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window