CHICKENLEY COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1123382
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 29 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 29 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 17 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 17 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 29 February 2016 12 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2016 12 October 2016 On time Download