CHICKENLEY COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1123382
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 29/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £125.48k £54.72k £127.51k £138.08k £172.83k
Total expenditure £89.00k £87.65k £75.13k £101.82k £151.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £4.55k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £29.82k £0 £32.01k £7.49k £16.11k