BRITISH IRAQI FRIENDSHIP SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Improving understanding between Britain and Iraq
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 March 2008: Standard registration
- 27 August 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE BRITISH IRAQI FRIENDSHIP SOCIETY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.44k | £42.17k | £38.97k | £11.76k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.71k | £42.57k | £45.54k | £10.61k | £7.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 25 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 31 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 31 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 31 July 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 25 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 25 August 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 8 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS THE OBJECTS ARE TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE CULTURE OF IRAQ; THAT IS ITS HISTORY, HERITAGE, ART, PERFORMING ARTS, LANGUAGE AND TRADITIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window