Governing document CARDIFF EDUCATIONAL ENDOWMENT TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 FEB 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 FEB 2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18 FEB 2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01 JUN 2017 as amended on 03 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ("THE OBJECTS") ARE 3.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE PRINCIPALLY INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF CARDIFF AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') 3.2 TO SUPPORT SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE CONNECTED WITH THE COMPANY AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
CARDIFF AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.