Financial history SOUTH HAMS COMMUNITY & VOLUNTARY SERVICES

Charity number: 1124273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £85.47k £103.80k £156.31k £59.01k £221.14k
Total expenditure £94.77k £97.85k £89.33k £81.19k £177.78k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £65.30k £42.62k £45.88k £51.00k £23.00k