THE LEWES PRIORY TRUST

Charity number: 1123751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £17.56k £47.03k £27.41k £20.19k £18.64k
Total expenditure £64.26k £39.90k £26.90k £26.34k £15.55k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.33k £11.90k £17.75k £12.57k £13.08k