THE LEWES PRIORY TRUST

Charity number: 1123751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Paul Robert Benjamin Trustee 17 June 2016 None on record
SY Morse-Brown Chair None on record
Susan Jean Murray Trustee 25 June 2021 None on record
Andrew John Norris Trustee 13 June 2014 None on record
Trevor John Parsons Trustee 25 June 2021 None on record
Anthony Freeman Trustee 15 June 2018
KNOWLEDGE OF ENGLAND LTD Received: On time
ARTHUR JOHN FRANKLIN Trustee 19 June 2012
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST WILFRID, HAYWARDS HEATH Received: On time
Ruth O'Keeffe Trustee 15 June 2018
LANDPORT COMMUNITY HUB Received: On time
LANDPORT YOUTH CENTRE Received: On time
PIPPA'S GROUP Received: On time
FRIENDS OF LEWES-THE LEWES CIVIC SOCIETY Received: On time
PELLS POOL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION Received: On time