Trustees THE MISSION TO SEAFARERS
Charity number: 1123613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THOMAS BOARDLEY | Chair | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Neale Francis Rodrigues | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
ANISHA STEPHANIE FRANKLIN | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Alexandra Jane Harwood | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Gary Chapman | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
The Venerable Michael Andrew Power | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Timothy John Smith | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
The Right Reverend David Grant Williams | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Peter James Cottrell | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
ROBERT THOMAS FERRIS | Trustee | 13 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
SAMUEL COMPTON SWIRE | Trustee | 27 January 2016 |
|
|||||||||
The Very Revd Andrew Tremlett | Trustee | 14 October 2015 |
|
|||||||||
CLAIRE ELIZABETH SNEDDON | Trustee | 14 October 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.