Financial history THE BOLTINI TRUST

Charity number: 1123129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £684.97k £625.50k £507.82k £477.54k £471.27k
Total expenditure £699.77k £564.19k £514.02k £526.48k £388.07k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £125.24k £50.25k £25.68k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £559.73k £575.26k £482.14k N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £689.63k £564.19k £514.02k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £10.13k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £8.95k £4.32k £1.13k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £680.69k £559.88k £512.89k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £10.13k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A