SWIMATHON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1123870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £1.48m £1.22m £1.30m £1.39m £989.00k
Total expenditure £1.31m £1.24m £1.25m £1.20m £1.19m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.28m £973.64k £1.09m £1.13m £831.09k
Income - Other trading activities £198.65k £242.08k £212.45k £248.37k £157.81k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £44 £0 £145 £173 £109
Income - Other £0 £0 £2.07k £9.83k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £190.76k £113.83k £106.26k £94.69k £131.80k
Expenditure - Raising funds £802.64k £816.63k £747.39k £856.59k £756.46k
Expenditure - Governance £24.60k £23.80k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £140.69k £54.20k £106.26k £38.71k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £321.24k £312.97k £395.44k £248.52k £302.27k