THE OPEN ACADEMY HEARTSEASE

Charity number: 1123318
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2011 Overdue Overdue by 3244 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Overdue Overdue by 3244 days
Annual return 31 August 2010 13 June 2011 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 13 June 2011 On time
Annual return 31 August 2009 01 June 2010 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 17 May 2010 On time