INTERNATIONAL ACTION FOR IRAQI REFUGEES

Charity number: 1123863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2020 20 December 2020 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2019 01 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2018 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2017 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2016 04 December 2016 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2016 04 December 2016 33 days late Download