INTERNATIONAL ACTION FOR IRAQI REFUGEES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. WE AIM TO FIND SPONSORS FOR ORPHANS, FAMILIES (WITHIN IRAQ, JORDAN AND SYRIA). ALSO, WE SUPPORT IRAQI STUDENTS IN EGYPT. 2. GIVE GRANTS TO HELP THE NEEDY FAMILIES IN IRAQ' SYRIA AND JORDAN. 3. PROVIDE MEDICATION FOR THE NEEDY IRAQIS. WE ORGANIZE FUNDRAISING SOCIAL ACTIVITIES IN THE UK.. 4. PROVIDE GRANTS TO SUPPORT CHARITABLE ORGANIZATIONS (WHO SUPPORT DISPLACED IRAQI FAMILIES) IN JORDAN.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Egypt
- Iraq
- Jordan
Governance
- 24 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ILHAM ABDULLATIF | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr LAMEES IBRAHIM | Trustee | 17 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MAHA SHAKARCHI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.55k | £3.72k | £500 | £2.35k | £2.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £8.63k | £11.41k | £11.51k | £9.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 21 April 2023 | 171 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 17 December 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 20 December 2020 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP * THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG IRAQI REFUGEES LIVING IN SYRIA, EGYPT AND JORDAN BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH [GOODS/SERVICES] WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS * THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG IRAQI REFUGEES LIVING IN SYRIA, EGYPT AND JORDAN AND IRAQ BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES. * THE RELIEF OF THE SICK-POOR LIVING IN SYRIA, EGYPT AND JORDAN EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISIONS OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES. 2 ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION * TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE IRAQI REFUGEES IN THE SUBJECT OF COMPUTER STUDIES * TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE IRAQI REFUGEE PUPILS AT [PUBLIC SCHOOLS IN SYRIA, EGYPT AND JORDAN] BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES [NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY] FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL 3 RELIEF OF SICKNESS * TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS IN SYRIA, EGYPT AND JORDAN * TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF WAR TRAUMA IN SYRIA, EGYPT AND JORDAN THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE
Area of benefit
SYRIA, EGYPT AND JORDAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
KENTON COURT
KENSINGTON HIGH STREET
LONDON
W14 8NW
- Phone:
- 07956225688
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window