Trustees HIGHTIDE FESTIVAL PRODUCTIONS LTD

Charity number: 1124477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR TIM CLARK Chair 09 November 2016
None on record
Kate Louise Harvey Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Matthew David Webb Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Jonathan Patric Gilchrist Trustee 20 May 2017
None on record
Leah Alison Schmidt Trustee 21 January 2017
None on record
Liz Fosbury Trustee 08 November 2016
None on record
Vinay Sunil Kumar Patel Trustee 13 July 2016
None on record