HOLLOWAY HALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1123156
Charity reporting is up to date (141 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 March 2021 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 March 2021 141 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 16 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 29 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 29 September 2016 On time Download