HOLLOWAY HALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1123156
Charity reporting is up to date (141 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £117.63k £82.30k £92.70k £62.80k £91.38k
Total expenditure £102.16k £69.31k £71.70k £81.68k £80.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £31.91k £33.29k N/A N/A