VOICE FOR THE VOICELESS UK

Charity number: 1123795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/03/2016 30/03/2017 30/03/2018 30/03/2019 30/03/2020
Total gross income £3.80k £4.30k £4.30k £5.50k £2.40k
Total expenditure £3.50k £4.10k £4.10k £5.00k £2.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A