EXODUS INTERNATIONAL MIRACLE CENTRE

Charity number: 1127863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 30 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 30 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 09 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 09 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 27 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 27 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 27 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 27 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 10 February 2019 316 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required