Y-GEN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/Training Economic/Community development/Employment Information Advice and Guidance for young people with Learning Difficulties and Disabilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Barnet
Governance
- 29 March 2008: Standard registration
- 01 October 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- Y-GEN LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.18m | £361.07k | £282.06k | £305.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.16m | £532.62k | £496.09k | £576.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.32m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £15.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £3.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.16m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.28k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 30 May 2013 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 20 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 16 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 16 January 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 09 June 2011 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 29 November 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 APRIL 2001, AS AMENDED 12 MARCH 2008 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE (IN THESE OBJECTS BEING AGED BETWEEN 8 AND 25 YEARS OLD) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, EDUCATION CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS AND WITHOUT LIMITATIONS TO 3.1) RAISE THE ASPIRATIONS PARTICIPATION AND ACHIEVEMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE 3.2) PROVIDE IMPARTIAL INFORMATION, ADVICE, GUIDANCE ON OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, 3.3) REFER AND INTRODUCE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE TO LEARNING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES AND SUPPORT THEIR PARTICIPATION IN APPROPRIATE LEARNING, 3.4) PROVIDE, PROCURE AND SUPPORT THE PROVISION OF LEARNING PROGRAMMES THAT ENABLE THE PERSONAL AND EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND PREPARE THEM FOR ADULT LIFE, 3.5) REFER AND INTRODUCE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE TO SERVICES AND FACILITIES WHICH CAN HELP THEM MEET THEIR NEEDS WITH RESPECT TO HEALTH AND WELLBEING, HOUSING, LEISURE FINANCE AND LEGAL ADVICE, 3.6) PROVIDE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OUTSIDE LEARNING, OR OTHERWISE AT RISK OF UNDERACHIEVING WITH THE SUPPORT THEY NEED TO FULFIL THEIR POTENTIAL, AND 3.7) CONDUCT AND DISSEMINATE RESEARCH AND GATHER INFORMATION ABOUT THE REQUIREMENTS, ATTRIBUTES LEARNING OPTIONS AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, AND 3.8) THE SECURING OF YOUNG PEOPLE'S INVOLVEMENT AND ENGAGEMENT IN THE SHAPING OF SERVICES AND ACTIVITIES TO MEET THEIR NEEDS AND INTERESTS INCLUDING THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF ACTIVE CITIZENSHIP
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, THROUGHOUT ENGLAND & WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window