THE NAVIGANT CONSULTING FOUNDATION
Charity Number: 1125479
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant Giving Charity, making grants to other charities in the areas of children, cancer and homelessness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Total income: £18,976
Total expenditure: £20,449
Fundraising
This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
Registration history:
- 12 August 2008: Standard registration
- 23 July 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 23 July 2018: Funds transferred to 1059029 RICHARD HOUSE TRUST
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.42k | £18.72k | £15.10k | £16.25k | £18.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.14k | £21.50k | £24.67k | £23.75k | £20.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 26 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 21 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 27 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window