SCHOOLS NORTHEAST

Charity number: 1129594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 25 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 25 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 24 July 2020 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 24 July 2020 54 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 08 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 12 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 12 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 17 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 17 November 2016 On time Download