SCHOOLS NORTHEAST

Charity number: 1129594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAIN VEITCH Trustee 01 October 2015 None on record
Colin Andrew Lofthouse Trustee 13 December 2016 None on record
David Mark Baldwin Trustee 17 November 2016
THE NORTH TYNESIDE CARERS CENTRE Received: On time
4TH TYNEMOUTH (CONGERS) SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
TYNEMOUTH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL Received: On time
NORTH TYNESIDE ACADEMY FOUNDATION Received: On time
MONICA SHEPHERD Trustee 01 October 2015 None on record
Kieran McLaughlin Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Kieran McGrane Trustee 01 October 2015 None on record
JOHN HARDY Chair 29 May 2012 None on record
MAURA REGAN Trustee 16 November 2016
DURHAM CATHEDRAL SCHOOLS FOUNDATION Received: On time
Dame Nicola Nelson Trustee 01 October 2015 None on record