SHIFT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1134546
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.04m £1.23m £1.78m £1.65m £1.41m
Total expenditure £1.04m £1.06m £1.74m £1.82m £1.33m
Income from government contracts £23.79k £50.39k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £12.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £697.01k £901.77k £1.63m £1.62m £1.38m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £23.92k £0 £2.12k
Income - Charitable activities £343.47k £329.51k £128.47k £26.99k £24.77k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £88 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £188 £0 £1.94k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.04m £1.06m £1.74m £1.82m £1.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds £7 £1.41k £3.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0