THAMES RIVER CAPITAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant making to charitable institutions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 April 2008: Standard registration
- 24 January 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £496.01k | £255.05k | £201.98k | £88.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £281.94k | £142.07k | £303.29k | £187.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 23 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 23 January 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 31 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 01 February 2012 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 30 November 2011 | 303 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 30 November 2011 | 303 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 30 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 30 January 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 12 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND BENEFIT SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. IN THIS TRUST DEED, 'CHARITABLE' MEANS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window