GULZARE MADINA ISLAMIC WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1131667
Charity reporting is up to date (23 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 February 2021 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 February 2021 23 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 26 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time Download