THE QUILLING GUILD

Charity number: 1123927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.58k £6.82k £7.08k £9.21k £7.50k
Total expenditure £7.95k £8.55k £8.70k £10.75k £7.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A