Accounts and annual returns DERBY COUNTY COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1123520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 10 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 10 March 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 16 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 16 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 25 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 10 June 2020 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 10 June 2020 41 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 July 2019 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 30 July 2019 91 days late Download Open in new window